Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Liberty Arms, Llc Dba Pine Grove, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Robby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Robby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Robby)
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
**RETURN OF SERVICE**
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
GOVERNMENT RENT AMOUNT
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
EVICTION HEARING NOTICE
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO VACATE
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service JETER, MONQUALIUM Served 02/28/2024 Response Due 03/13/2024 Returned 02/28/2024
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
RENT AMOUNT
Judge: Cox, Robby |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Cox, Robby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.