Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Gearhart, Carl, Gearhart, Taylor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jim Gossett, against Lyft, Inc., Olatunji, Olumuyiwa, represented by Bryan D. Pollard, Daniel M. Karp, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts 124th District Court with F. Alfonso Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeF. Alfonso Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Personal Injury/Damages |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House124th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Process Server
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Olatunji, Olumuyiwa Served 03/26/2024 Response Received 04/17/2024 Returned 04/03/2024 Lyft, Inc. Unserved Response Received 04/15/2024
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Olatunji, Olumuyiwa Unserved Lyft, Inc. Unserved
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.