Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morrow, Justin Dale, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Morrow, Sarah Jo, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation MORROW, JUSTIN DALE Unserved MORROW, SARAH JO Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Enforcement (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Email
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Of Divorce
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice And Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.