Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case represented by Jennie Radulescu, against Unknown Father, Sanchez, Pablo, represented by Paula Hunt, Darrell Hyatt, Kimberley Miller Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Termination (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (1:15 PM) ()
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judicial Review (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Permanency Hearing Order Before Final Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Casa Court Report
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Paternity Registry
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Inquiry on Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inquiry on Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Paternity Registry Search
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.