Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Foster, Xavier R., in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation GUY, GEROME DEON Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation GUY, GEROME DEON Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.