Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation BATES, JORDAN DOYLE Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation BATES, JORDAN DOYLE Served 03/11/2020 Response Due 04/06/2020 Returned 03/13/2020
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation BATES, JORDAN DOYLE Returned Unserved 02/17/2020 Returned 02/17/2020
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.