Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cortez, Nora O, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Myla G. Mayberry, against Perez, Jonathan L, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce W/ Pcr |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Green Card
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Employer Withholding Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Writ of Withholding
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Record of Support
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (Dismissal Docket Case) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Reset Hearing Date CANCELED Dismissal Docket (1:15 PM) () Reset Hearing Date Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.