Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Discover Bank, Jenkins, Robert E, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mildred Anaele, Robert E. Jenkins, Tenia Ouellette, against Platt, Terry G., in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Charles, Alfonso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Oath Of Receiver
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Receiver
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Designate/Lead Counsel
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Receiver
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment OCA
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Process Server
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation PLATT, TERRY G. Served 01/05/2019 Response Due 01/28/2019 Returned 01/07/2019
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.