Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2015 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Rights
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Process Server
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation MONTOYA, EDDIE Served 07/13/2019 Response Due 08/05/2019 Returned 07/17/2019 SMITH, ASHLEY NICOLE Served 07/01/2019 Response Due 07/22/2019 Returned 07/09/2019
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.