Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cash Bond
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Release Funds
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Rights
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release Order and Re-Set Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Arrest Warrant Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.