Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asencio, Brenda Alondra filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Child Support Review Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Suit Affecting Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.