Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2014 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Nonsuit
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort out of County
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice ORONO, JESUS E Returned Unserved 01/29/2015 Returned 01/29/2015
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.