Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Nonsuit
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation CRAYTON, TERRENCE Served 12/24/2014 Response Due 01/19/2015 THOMAS, DEKESHIA Served 12/24/2014 Response Due 01/19/2015
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.