Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation LAUGHLIN, MATTHEW Served 11/27/2018 Response Due 12/24/2018 Returned 11/28/2018 Williams, Brandy Served 11/27/2018 Response Due 12/24/2018 Returned 11/28/2018
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Williams, Brandy Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation LAUGHLIN, MATTHEW Returned Unserved 10/16/2018 Returned 10/16/2018 Williams, Brandy Returned Unserved 10/10/2018 Returned 10/10/2018
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.