Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brandy R Bonner filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryAg - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bill Of Costs
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mot/Order Pay Atty
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Release Order and Re-Set Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Order Appointing Attorney Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Capias Return/Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Capias Cook, Adrienne N Served 05/03/2016 Returned 05/04/2016
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Cook, Adrienne N Served 02/20/2015 Response Due 03/16/2015 Returned 02/24/2015
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.