Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gunn, Penny Patrick, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Raymond Bo Rogers, Jr., against Gunn, Michael Steven, represented by David B Griffith, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce W/ Pcr |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Email
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry Of Judgment (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim) 11/21/2016 Reset by Court to 11/21/2016
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.