Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Suit To Remove Cloud From Title case represented by Keith A Taylor, against Hunter, Larhonda, Hunter, Janice Marie, Hunter, Frank N., Hunter, Frances, Hunter, Donald Eugene, (total of 6) See All represented by Alex Tyra, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Charles, Alfonso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategorySuit To Remove Cloud From Title |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Dismissal Return
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Dismissal Return
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Dismissal Return
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Charles, Alfonso)
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.