Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Adela Victoria, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Peter G Milne, against Gonzalez Iiii, Alvaro, represented by Clifford R Jessup, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
CategoryAg - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Enforcement (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.