Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kilgore National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas H Brown, against Saurenmann, Joseph Paul, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Charles, Alfonso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Execution Return Out of County
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Issue Execution Saurenmann, Joseph Paul Served 04/08/2015 Returned 04/24/2015
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment OCA
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Last Known Address
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Out of County
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.