Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jarosz, Crystal, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bradley T. Steele, against Coscione, Melanie Dawn, Coscione, Anthony Cecil, represented by Mark E Cannon, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Charles, Alfonso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Information
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Charles, Alfonso) 01/26/2015 Reset by Court to 03/05/2015
Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Order Appointing Attorney Judge: Charles, Alfonso |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.