Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
2001 Loop Partners, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bruce A. Smith, against Crosson, Troy, represented by Jonathan Wharton, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Brabham, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Suggestion
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Capias Recalled
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing (10:30 AM) ()
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Approving the Withdrawal As Counsel of Record
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdrawl Counsel of Record
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Brabham, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.