Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2006 |
CategoryModification |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Nonsuit
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return Of Service
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort Sheriff
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Busher, Sam J Returned Unserved 11/10/2017 Returned 11/10/2017
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reset Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort out of County
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.