Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meyers, Leighton Welllington, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Meyers, Janette Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Decree Of Divorce
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Out of County
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Meyers, Janette Michelle Served 11/05/2007 Response Due 11/26/2007
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sage, Robin)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Original Petition Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.