Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
North Star Capital Acquisitions Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Melvin Thathiah, against Gunn, Donna L, Gunn, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Brabham, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Out of County
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Amended Petition
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Citation Gunn, Donna L Served 07/09/2007 Response Due 07/30/2007
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Citation Gunn, Dennis Served 07/09/2007 Response Due 07/30/2007
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment OCA
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Brabham, David |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Last Known Address
Judge: Brabham, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.