Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abshire, Shamala Sheree, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Michael D Martin, against Abshire, James Lee, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Of Dismissal (OCA)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Abshire, James Lee Served 02/08/2007
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Original Petition Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.