Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hale, Kristopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kate Bennett, against Hale, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce W/ Pcr |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Change Of Payee
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order To Stop Child Support Withholding Order To Stop Child Support Withholding Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request Issue Order Withhold Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Of Dismissal (OCA)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Order Appointing Attorney Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.