Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2006 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Woodard, Trevorris Served 11/30/2006
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Gray, Krystal Danye Served 11/20/2006
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.