Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2006 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Child Support Review Order
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation Davis, Tommy Lynn Served 11/14/2006
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.