Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.