Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Temporary
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion For Temporary Orders
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Blood Test Results
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order For Paternity Testing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.