Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2004 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Blood Test Results
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order For Paternity Testing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.