Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2004 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Out of County
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Blood Test Results
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order For Paternity Testing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Effort out of County
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.