Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2003 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
July 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
July 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
June 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
June 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.