Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Tracy Fleck, against Rogers, Geonna E, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2001 |
CategoryFamily Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request Issue Order Withhold Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing Parent Child Relationship
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
March 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Blood Test Results
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order For Paternity Testing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 03, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation Baker, Alton Served 12/20/2001 Response Due 01/14/2002
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.