Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watts, Patricia, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Raymond Bo Rogers, Jr., against Rook, Dean, represented by John G. Troy, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2004 |
CategoryModification Mc |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Delinquency
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Entry Of Judgment (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sage, Robin)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order For Motion To Modify
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Writ of Withholding
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order For Continuance
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.