Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Joseph L Perkins, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Sage, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 1999 |
CategoryEnforcement Of Prior Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
Change Of Address
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
October 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Appeal From J. P. Court (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Sage, Robin)
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 10, 2000 | Docket Event |
Order For Motion To Modify
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 10, 2000 | Docket Event |
Request Issue Order Withhold Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
February 10, 2000 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding Income
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 29, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Sheriff
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 21, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Registered Mail
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation Stapp, Jerry Paul Served 12/22/1999 Response Due 01/17/2000
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation Stapp, Debra Ann Served 12/13/1999 Response Due 01/03/2000
Judge: Sage, Robin |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Sage, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.