Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hyson, Briella, Niblock, Heather, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lawrence M Tylka, against Sanchez, Ashley Renee, The City Of Texas City, represented by Ricardo J. Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Foley, Kerri presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Proposed Order
Date: September 26, 2023Plea To The Jurisdiction
Date: September 26, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 20, 2023Amended Notices Of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2023Notice Of Oral Hearing
Date: September 19, 2023Request For Oral Hearing
Date: September 18, 2023Status Conference
Date: July 24, 2023Original Answer
Date: September 18, 2023Request
Date: July 24, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Foley, Kerri) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Foley, Kerri, Foley, Kerri) Special Exceptions Special Exceptions |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Reset CANCELED Motion Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Foley, Kerri, Foley, Kerri) Reset Special Exceptions |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Plea to Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss Proposed Order Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Ashley Renee Sanchez Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Ashley Renee Sanchez |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plea To The Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Ashley Renee Sanchez Plea To The Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Ashley Renee Sanchez |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Eserved 9/20/23 Eserved 9/20/23 |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Notices Of Hearing | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Oral Hearing | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Email sent to ATTY w/regard to setting. cc Email sent to ATTY w/regard to setting. cc |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request For Oral Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.