Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
David Wight Construction Company, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Todd, Alton C., against Friendswood Cypress, Lp, Osei Interest, Llc, Redman, Eric, Reaves, Glen, represented by Smart, Peter C., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Foley, Kerri presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Abate (OCA) | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Abate - Signed. CD/MP |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Attorney | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion to Abate |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion For Continuance | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice Of Oral Hearing | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Abate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.