Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bestick, Melissa E, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Dupuy, Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Rule Card | |
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment Rule 306a issued and mailed to all parties |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Unsigned By Judge | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR NON-SUIT Order For Nonsuit (Closes Case) (OCA) |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment Order for Nonsuit Granted APOF |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment Notice of Nonsuit filed (Proposed Order received) by atty Richard Clark |
|
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT Notice Of Nonsuit |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Correspondence By Fax | |
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment Correspondence by Fax RE: Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing filed by David Torok |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.