Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas Tri Coastal Properties Llc, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases case represented by Eiland, A. Craig, against Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, Reid, Jones, Mcrorie & Williams, represented by Tatsch, William L, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Take Nothing Judgment signed/BER |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Rule Card | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Take Nothing Judgment (OCA) | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence From Attorney Proposed Agreed Judgment |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment Docket Entry RE: DCO signed APOF, PTC set 06/03/11 @ 9:00AM, JTRL set 06/13/11 @ 9:00AM |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Substituting Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.