Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lhr, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hull, James Nace, Jenkins, Jody D., against Bergeron, Ricki M. Indv &, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ - Service Tubed to GCSO |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Record Statement Deputy Reporter |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Application for Issuance of Writ of Scire Facias Order Issuance of Writ of Scire Facias |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Writ of Scire Facias - ZOOM link requested and sent to atty Jenkins |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Hearing on Application for Writ of Scire Facias. Movant appeared via Zoom. Defendant failed to appear. Mtn. granted per order signed. TS / kf |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Emailed atty regarding hearing ... |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application to Revive Judgment Application To Revive Judgment |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Designation Of Lead Counsel and Notice of Change in Ownership Designation Of Lead Counsel and Notice of Change in Ownership |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.