Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Jones, John D., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 2 with Roberts, Barbara E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberts, Barbara E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Rule Card | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Rule Card 306a mailed to all parties |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR NON-SUIT Order For Nonsuit (Closes Case) (OCA) |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Docket Entry RE: Order for Nonsuit signed APOF |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Attorney | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Notice of Nonsuit filed by Lindsay B Nickle (proposed order rec'd) |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT Notice Of Nonsuit |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.