Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Morton, Ronnie L., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law No. 3 with Dupuy, Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDupuy, Christopher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law No. 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Rule Card | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment RULE 306A ISSUED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment PER DOCKET ENTRY: CASE IS DWOP (NO ONE APPEARED) RQ/cn |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Judge | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Court has set another S/C date for 12/20/07 @ 1:30pm/failure to appear will result in DWOP |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment S/C reset to 9/27/07 @ 1:30pm |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Copy of Answer sent to Sam Streeter's Office |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Rqst for a copy of Def's Original Answer |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.