Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arguel, Jesus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Escalambre, Alejandrina, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 10, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions460 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time460 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Sep 13 2010 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Arguel, J. vs. Escalambre, A. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 929320-Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner DISCLOSURE [929320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Arguel, J. vs. Escalambre, A. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.