Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Ali, Nizar, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Leonard J. Meyer, against Charolia, Salim, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Jones, Jeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2024 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
This complaint was filed by Nizar Ali against Salim Charolia in the District Court of Galveston County, Texas. Nizar Ali is seeking damages within the jurisdictional limits of the court, including monetary relief that may be in excess of $250,000 but...
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: April 22, 2024Request for Civil Service
Date: March 27, 2024Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 28, 2024Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 28, 2024Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 27, 2024Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: April 24, 2024Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 28, 2024Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Jones, Jeth ) status conference set 06/27/2024@9:30AM status conference set 06/27/2024@9:30AM |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Return of Service -Salim Charolia Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service -Salim Charolia |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of status conference of status conference |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e-citation of e-citation |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet emailed to attorney emailed to attorney |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued and emailed to attorney 1 citation issued and emailed to attorney |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Service Request for Civil Service 1 citation to be issued via email. Assigned to M.M 1 citation to be issued via email. Assigned to M.M |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Original Petition - OCA Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.