Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEwing, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 13, 2023Original Answer
Date: July 19, 2023Temporary Restraining Order - Issued - OCA - Work Product
Date: June 30, 2023Request for Copies
Date: September 25, 2023Status Report
Date: October 19, 2023Request for Service
Date: June 28, 2023Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 29, 2023Motion to Modify
Date: November 17, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 31, 2023Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 30, 2023Affidavit of Service
Date: July 18, 2023Email Verification - Service Receipt
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack) DCO NEEDED 10/19/2023 Reset by Court to 12/07/2023 DCO NEEDED |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fisher, Emily) Motion to Modify and Mediation Motion to Modify and Mediation |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Temporary Orders Motion to Modify Motion to Modify Temporary Orders |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
First Amended Motion for Mediation Amended Motion First Amended Motion for Mediation |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation w/ Notice of Hearing Motion for Mediation w/ Notice of Hearing |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISCOVERY Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisement -lm -lm |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Ewing, Jack ) -ZB -ZB |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Respondent Certificate of Written Discovery Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery -lm Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery -lm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.