Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chimi, Eddy, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Selexman, Danyahn Skyy, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Date: September 05, 2023Request for Writ of Possession
Date: August 24, 2023Writ of Possession $205
Date: August 24, 2023Letter From Clerk
Date: August 14, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: August 14, 2023Case Summary
Date: August 14, 2023Notice to Vacate
Date: August 14, 2023Lease
Date: August 14, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: July 27, 2023Citation and Return
Date: August 01, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter From Clerk
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Vacate
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lease
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $1,881.00Awarded To: Eddy ChimiAwarded Against: Danyahn Selexman |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.