Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aim Realty Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Luvaul, Diamond Lee, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Date: September 14, 2023Letter From Clerk
Date: August 14, 2023Writ of Possession $205
Date: August 29, 2023Request for Writ of Possession
Date: August 29, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: August 14, 2023Case Summary
Date: August 14, 2023Citation and Return
Date: August 10, 2023Affidavit Alternate Service
Date: August 07, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: July 27, 2023Order Authorizing Alternate Service
Date: August 07, 2023Lease
Date: July 27, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA) CANCELED CANCELED Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter From Clerk
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Alternate Service
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Alternate Service
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,045.00Awarded To: AIM Realty Inc.Awarded Against: Diamond Luvaul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.