Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wood, George, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Edwards, Chandra Scherrie, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Billy A., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment - 0310 |
Letter From Clerk
Date: July 03, 2023Default Judgment (OCA)
Date: July 03, 2023Case Summary
Date: July 03, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 29, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: June 15, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter From Clerk
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Eviction - (OCA) LM LM Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Edwards, Chandra Scherrie Served 06/19/2023 Returned 06/29/2023
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. Judgment of $4,181.00Awarded To: GEORGE WOODAwarded Against: Chandra Edwards |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - Service Edwards, Chandra Scherrie Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.