Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Manage 4 Us, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hatcher, Jarod, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Billy A., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff - 0360 |
Case Summary
Date: June 27, 2023Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Date: June 27, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 15, 2023Notice to Vacate
Date: June 14, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: June 14, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Passed by Plaintiff CANCELED Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.) Passed by Plaintiff Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.) | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Vacate
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Eviction - (OCA) LM LM Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Hatcher, Jarod Served 06/14/2023 Returned 06/15/2023
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.